LA SB165 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-5)
Status: Passed on May 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-23 - Effective date 1/1/2025.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-5)
Status: Passed on May 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-23 - Effective date 1/1/2025.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to noncompetition agreements. (8/1/24)
Title
Provides relative to noncompetition agreements. (8/1/24)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-14 - House - House Vote on SB 165 FINAL PASSAGE (#1048) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 165 CO-AUTHORS (#229) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 165 FINAL PASSAGE (#228) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 165 CO-AUTHORS (#229) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 165 FINAL PASSAGE (#228) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-23 | Senate | Effective date 1/1/2025. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 273. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2024-05-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2024-05-14 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-05-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/14/2024. |
2024-04-29 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-25 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2024-04-24 | House | Reported with amendments (15-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2024-04-09 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare |