LA SB212 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-11 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-11 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the membership of the Louisiana Agricultural Commodities Commission. (gov sig)
Title
Provides relative to the membership of the Louisiana Agricultural Commodities Commission. (gov sig)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-28 - House - House Vote on SB 212 FINAL PASSAGE (#527) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 212 FINAL PASSAGE (#107) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 212 FINAL PASSAGE (#107) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-11 | Senate | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 235. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2020-05-31 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2020-05-28 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-05-22 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/28/20. |
2020-05-22 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-21 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2020-05-20 | House | Reported favorably (15-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2020-05-13 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title; ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. |