LA SB252 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-11 - Effective date 1/1/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-11 - Effective date 1/1/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for driver education to include instruction relative to accessible parking and access aisles. (1/1/21)
Title
Provides for driver education to include instruction relative to accessible parking and access aisles. (1/1/21)
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Carter [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-27 - House - House Vote on SB 252 FINAL PASSAGE (#455) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 252 FINAL PASSAGE (#110) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 252 FINAL PASSAGE (#110) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-11 | Senate | Effective date 1/1/2021. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 223. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2020-05-31 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2020-05-27 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-05-22 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/27/20. |
2020-05-21 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-20 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2020-05-20 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2020-05-13 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title; ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |