LA SB384 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-04 - Effective date 8/1/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-04 - Effective date 8/1/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requires issuers of state municipal securities to comply with certain continuing disclosure rules of the United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (8/1/14) (EN NO IMPACT GF EX See Note)
Title
Requires issuers of state municipal securities to comply with certain continuing disclosure rules of the United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (8/1/14) (EN NO IMPACT GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 384 CONCUR (#1299) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-05-20 - House - House Vote on SB 384 FINAL PASSAGE (#1089) (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 384 FINAL PASSAGE (#252) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-20 - House - House Vote on SB 384 FINAL PASSAGE (#1089) (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 384 FINAL PASSAGE (#252) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-04 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2014. |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 463. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2014-05-27 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2014-05-26 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2014-05-20 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 87, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2014-05-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/20/2014. |
2014-05-13 | House | Notice given. |
2014-05-07 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2014-04-30 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/07/2014. |
2014-04-30 | House | Notice given. |
2014-04-30 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2014-04-24 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/30/2014. |
2014-04-24 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2014-04-23 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2014-04-22 | House | Reported favorably (15-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2014-04-07 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2014-04-03 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |