LA SB395 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Effective date 1/1/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Effective date 1/1/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the Louisiana State Law Institute. (1/1/17) (EG DECREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the Louisiana State Law Institute. (1/1/17) (EG DECREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-05 - House - House Vote on SB 395 MOTION TO ADOPT (#1323) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 395 ADOPT (#1293) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 395 REJECT (#1100) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-05-25 - House - House Vote on SB 395 FINAL PASSAGE (#1029) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 395 FINAL PASSAGE (#449) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 395 ADOPT (#1293) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 395 REJECT (#1100) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-05-25 - House - House Vote on SB 395 FINAL PASSAGE (#1029) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 395 FINAL PASSAGE (#449) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | Senate | Effective date 1/1/2017. |
2016-06-17 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 536. |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2016-06-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-06-05 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2016-06-05 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 96, nays 2. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2016-06-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/05/2016. |
2016-06-03 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Conference committee report received. |
2016-06-03 | House | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2016-06-02 | House | House conferees appointed: Broadwater, Danahay, and Abramson. |
2016-06-01 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Ward, Martiny, and Milkovich. |
2016-05-31 | House | Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments. |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2016-05-25 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 2. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2016-05-19 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/25/2016. |
2016-05-13 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-05-12 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2016-05-11 | House | Reported with amendments (7-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2016-05-02 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2016-04-28 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |