LA SB421 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-19 - Effective date 8/1/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-19 - Effective date 8/1/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a renaissance district in certain parishes. (8/1/24) (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF EX See Note)
Title
Creates a renaissance district in certain parishes. (8/1/24) (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 421 CONCUR (#1207) (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - House - House Vote on SB 421 FINAL PASSAGE (#1327) (Y: 76 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - House - House Vote on SB 421 MODIFY TIME LIMITS (#1326) (Y: 26 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [FAIL]
2024-04-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 421 FINAL PASSAGE (#345) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - House - House Vote on SB 421 FINAL PASSAGE (#1327) (Y: 76 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - House - House Vote on SB 421 MODIFY TIME LIMITS (#1326) (Y: 26 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [FAIL]
2024-04-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 421 FINAL PASSAGE (#345) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-19 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2024. |
2024-06-19 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 767. |
2024-05-31 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2024-05-30 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2024-05-28 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 32 yeas and 3 nays. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2024-05-22 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 76, nays 18. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-05-21 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/2024. |
2024-05-21 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-05-20 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2024-05-15 | House | Reported with amendments (8-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-04-24 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2024-04-23 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |