LA SB43 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-20 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-20 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the regulation of certain advertisements for legal services. (8/1/21)
Title
Provides for the regulation of certain advertisements for legal services. (8/1/21)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 43 CONCUR (#982) (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House Vote on SB 43 FINAL PASSAGE (#1048) (Y: 70 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 43 FINAL PASSAGE (#293) (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House Vote on SB 43 FINAL PASSAGE (#1048) (Y: 70 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 43 FINAL PASSAGE (#293) (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-20 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2021-07-20 | Senate | Reconsidered. |
2021-07-20 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2021-07-20 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2021-07-20 | Senate | Veto message from the Governor received and read. |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/11/2021. |
2021-06-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 34 yeas and 1 nays. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2021-06-07 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 70, nays 30. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2021-06-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/07/2021. |
2021-06-03 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-06-02 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2021-06-01 | House | Reported with amendments (9-3). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2021-05-12 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2021-05-11 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 28 yeas and 8 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |