LA SB431 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-11 - Effective date 6/11/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-11 - Effective date 6/11/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides with respect to the creation of the Juvenile Detention Commission for the purpose of reviewing and recommending funding for juvenile detention centers. (gov sig) (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides with respect to the creation of the Juvenile Detention Commission for the purpose of reviewing and recommending funding for juvenile detention centers. (gov sig) (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 431 CONCUR (#1446) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-05-31 - House - House Vote on SB 431 FINAL PASSAGE (#1722) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-05-31 - House - House Vote on SB 431 MODIFY TIME LIMITS (#1721) (Y: 50 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 431 FINAL PASSAGE (#493) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-31 - House - House Vote on SB 431 FINAL PASSAGE (#1722) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-05-31 - House - House Vote on SB 431 MODIFY TIME LIMITS (#1721) (Y: 50 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 431 FINAL PASSAGE (#493) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-11 | Senate | Effective date 6/11/2024. |
2024-06-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 587. |
2024-06-03 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2024-06-03 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-06-03 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2024-06-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. |
2024-05-31 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2024-05-31 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 2. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-05-31 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2024-05-31 | House | Rules suspended. |
2024-05-30 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2024-05-30 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/2024. |
2024-05-30 | House | Rules suspended. |
2024-05-30 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-05-29 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2024-05-28 | House | Reported favorably (14-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-05-20 | House | Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2024-05-15 | House | Reported favorably (9-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2024-05-07 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2024-05-06 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |