LA SB45 | 2020 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-10)
Status: Passed on October 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-28 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-10)
Status: Passed on October 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-28 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the "Lod Cook Act" which authorizes the governor to appoint persons who reside out-of-state at certain at-large members of the public postsecondary boards of supervisors. (See Act) (Item #42) (EN INCREASE SG EX See Note)
Title
Provides for the "Lod Cook Act" which authorizes the governor to appoint persons who reside out-of-state at certain at-large members of the public postsecondary boards of supervisors. (See Act) (Item #42) (EN INCREASE SG EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 45 CONCUR (#131) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-10-15 - House - House Vote on SB 45 FINAL PASSAGE (#158) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-10-12 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 45 CO-AUTHORS (#62) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-10-12 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 45 FINAL PASSAGE (#61) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-10-15 - House - House Vote on SB 45 FINAL PASSAGE (#158) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-10-12 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 45 CO-AUTHORS (#62) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-10-12 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 45 FINAL PASSAGE (#61) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-28 | Senate | Effective date: See Act. |
2020-10-28 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 38. |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2020-10-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-10-20 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-10-19 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. |
2020-10-15 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2020-10-15 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-10-14 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 10/15/20. |
2020-10-14 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-10-14 | House | Rules suspended. |
2020-10-14 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2020-10-14 | House | Reported with amendments (9-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2020-10-13 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2020-10-12 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2020-10-07 | Senate | Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-09-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education. |