LA SB467 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-10 - Effective date 6/10/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-10 - Effective date 6/10/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the office of the state public defender. (gov sig) (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF RV)
Title
Provides for the office of the state public defender. (gov sig) (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF RV)
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Reese [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 467 CONCUR (#1213) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - House - House Vote on SB 467 FINAL PASSAGE (#1328) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 467 FINAL PASSAGE (#311) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - House - House Vote on SB 467 FINAL PASSAGE (#1328) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 467 FINAL PASSAGE (#311) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-10 | Senate | Effective date 6/10/2024. |
2024-06-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 528. |
2024-05-31 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2024-05-30 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2024-05-28 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2024-05-22 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-05-21 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/2024. |
2024-05-21 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-05-20 | House | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2024-05-15 | House | Reported with amendments (9-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-04-18 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2024-04-17 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |