LA SB488 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-11 - Effective date 8/1/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-11 - Effective date 8/1/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits making false statements in elections regarding candidates. (8/1/24)
Title
Prohibits making false statements in elections regarding candidates. (8/1/24)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 488 CONCUR (#1214) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - House - House Vote on SB 488 FINAL PASSAGE (#1330) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 488 FINAL PASSAGE (#398) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - House - House Vote on SB 488 FINAL PASSAGE (#1330) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 488 FINAL PASSAGE (#398) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-11 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2024. |
2024-06-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 589. |
2024-05-31 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2024-05-30 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2024-05-28 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2024-05-22 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-05-21 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/2024. |
2024-05-21 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-05-20 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2024-05-15 | House | Reported with amendments (14-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-04-24 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2024-04-23 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |