LA SB498 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-04 - Effective date 6/4/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-04 - Effective date 6/4/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for tax filing and payment extensions. (gov sig) (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)
Title
Provides for tax filing and payment extensions. (gov sig) (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 498 CONCUR (#444) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Vote on SB 498 FINAL PASSAGE (#477) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 498 FINAL PASSAGE (#148) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Vote on SB 498 FINAL PASSAGE (#477) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 498 FINAL PASSAGE (#148) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-04 | Senate | Effective date 6/4/2020. |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 47. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2020-06-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2020-05-27 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-05-22 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/27/20. |
2020-05-21 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-20 | House | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2020-05-18 | House | Reported favorably (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2020-05-13 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-05-04 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2020-03-31 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |