LA SB64 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Re-creates the Department of Public Service. (6/30/18)
Title
Re-creates the Department of Public Service. (6/30/18)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 64 FINAL PASSAGE (#94) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2018-04-27 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/03/18. |
2018-04-18 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-17 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2018-04-16 | House | Reported favorably (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-03-21 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2018-03-20 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |