LA SB738 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-07 - Effective date 6/7/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-07 - Effective date 6/7/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to a claim of self-defense. (gov sig)
Title
Provides relative to a claim of self-defense. (gov sig)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-30 - House - House Vote on SB 738, FINAL PASSAGE (#1330) (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 738, FINAL PASSAGE (#575) (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 738, FINAL PASSAGE (#575) (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-07 | Effective date 6/7/12. | |
2012-06-07 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 690. | |
2012-06-01 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2012-05-31 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-05-31 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-05-30 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2012-05-30 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 87, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-05-24 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/30/2012. | |
2012-05-21 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-05-17 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2012-05-16 | Reported favorably (9-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2012-05-02 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |
2012-05-01 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2012-04-30 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 1 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-04-25 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-04-24 | Reported with amendments. | |
2012-04-03 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |