LA SCR28 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates May 28, 2019, as Certified Louisiana Day.
Title
Designates May 28, 2019, as Certified Louisiana Day.
Sponsors
Sen. Dale Erdey [R] | Sen. Rogers Pope [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 28 ADOPT (#96) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2019-04-25 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2019-04-23 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2019-04-23 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |