LA SCR3 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for legislative approval of the MFP formula for the 2019-2020 Fiscal Year. (EN +$145,214,142 GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides for legislative approval of the MFP formula for the 2019-2020 Fiscal Year. (EN +$145,214,142 GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - House - House Vote on SCR 3 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#865) (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 3 CO-AUTHORS (#358) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 3 ADOPT (#357) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 3 CO-AUTHORS (#358) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 3 ADOPT (#357) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2019. |
2019-06-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2019-06-03 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 104 yeas, 0 nays. |
2019-06-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/19. |
2019-06-02 | House | Made Special Order of the day No. 2 for 06/03/19. |
2019-06-02 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-06-02 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2019-06-02 | House | Reported favorably (23-0). |
2019-05-31 | House | Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2019-05-30 | House | Reported favorably (14-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2019-05-16 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2019-05-15 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 1 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |