LA SCR59 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-10 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 05/06.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-10 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 05/06.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Andrew Murphy, a student at Captain Shreve High School, on being named the 2010 Louisiana High School Student of the Year.
Title
Commends Andrew Murphy, a student at Captain Shreve High School, on being named the 2010 Louisiana High School Student of the Year.
Sponsors
Sen. Sherri Cheek [R] | Sen. B.L. Shaw [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 59, ADOPT (#383) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-10 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 05/06. | |
2010-05-04 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-05-04 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-05-03 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2010-04-29 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | |
2010-04-28 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |
2010-04-28 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |