LA SCR59 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-13 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 06/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-13 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 06/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends the Sam Houston High School Lady Broncos on winning the Class 4A State Softball Championship.
Title
Commends the Sam Houston High School Lady Broncos on winning the Class 4A State Softball Championship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 59, ADOPT (#389) (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-13 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 06/10. | |
2011-06-09 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2011-06-08 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2011-06-07 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2011-06-07 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | |
2011-06-07 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |
2011-06-07 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 28 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | |
2011-06-06 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |