LA SR11 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates task force to study the postsecondary education disciplinary process for campus rape and sexual assault.
Title
Creates task force to study the postsecondary education disciplinary process for campus rape and sexual assault.
Sponsors
Sen. Jean-Paul Morrell [D] | Sen. Karen Peterson [D] | Rep. Bryan Adams [R] | Sen. Wesley Bishop [D] |
Rep. Jerry Gisclair [D] | Rep. Patrick Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |