LA SR11 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/2/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/2/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the secretary of state and the state Department of Education to work together to develop age-appropriate, nonpartisan voter education materials to be used by all students in grades 3-12.
Title
Requests the secretary of state and the state Department of Education to work together to develop age-appropriate, nonpartisan voter education materials to be used by all students in grades 3-12.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/2/2019. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |