LA SR14 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/4/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/4/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Community Responder Task Force to study the implementation of a partnership between law enforcement agencies, behavioral health providers, and hospitals.
Title
Creates the Community Responder Task Force to study the implementation of a partnership between law enforcement agencies, behavioral health providers, and hospitals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/4/2024. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |