LA SR19 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-12 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-12 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends the Louisiana Court Appointed Special Advocate (CASA) programs and volunteers and recognizes May 26, 2020, as CASA Day at the Louisiana State Capitol.
Title
Commends the Louisiana Court Appointed Special Advocate (CASA) programs and volunteers and recognizes May 26, 2020, as CASA Day at the Louisiana State Capitol.
Sponsors
Sen. Beth Mizell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-12 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2020-05-04 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |