MA H104 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3594
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 114-1-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-13 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) adopted, see H3594
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-13 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) adopted, see H3594
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to aid to parents with dependent children. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
To lift the cap on kids
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - House - House On Recommittal Yea and Nay No. 32 (Y: 31 N: 126 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | House | Amendment (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) adopted, see H3594 |
2019-03-13 | House | Motion to recommit to the committee on House Ways and Means negatived - 31 YEAS to 126 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 32) |
2019-03-13 | House | Read second |
2019-03-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-03-13 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting with the amendment pending |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2019-03-13 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill with the same title, see H3594 |
2019-03-07 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-03-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/05/2019 from 03:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-03-05 | Joint | Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD |
2019-03-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/05/2019 from 02:45 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-03-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/05/2019 from 11:30 AM-02:45 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H3594 (Replaced by) 2019-04-25 - Chapter 11 of the Acts of 2019
S36 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S36 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H104 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H104.pdf |
Roll Call | https://malegislature.gov/Journal/House/191/RollCalls/hj03132019_RollCalls.pdf |