MA H3594 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Chapter 11 of the Acts of 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Chapter 11 of the Acts of 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To lift the cap on kids
Title
To lift the cap on kids
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Question on passing Veto Override, notwithstanding the objections of the Governor Roll Call #21 (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House shall the bill pass notwithstanding Yea and Nay No. 35 (Y: 155 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Engrossed Roll Call #19 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House On Engrossment Yea and Nay No. 33 (Y: 155 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House shall the bill pass notwithstanding Yea and Nay No. 35 (Y: 155 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Engrossed Roll Call #19 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House On Engrossment Yea and Nay No. 33 (Y: 155 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | Joint | Chapter 11 of the Acts of 2019 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Passed over veto -see Roll Call #21 (Yeas 37 to Nays 3) |
2019-04-10 | House | Passed over veto - 155 YEAS to 1 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 35) |
2019-04-10 | House | Postponed until 1:00pm |
2019-04-10 | House | For message, see H3686 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2019-04-04 | House | Enacted |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2019-04-04 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2019-04-04 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #19 (yeas 37 to Nays 1) |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Read third |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Amended by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S2186 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Read second |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Accompanied by S37 |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, inserting in place thereof the text of S2186 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-03-13 | House | Passed to be engrossed - 155 YEAS to 1 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 33) |
2019-03-13 | House | Read third |
2019-03-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-03-13 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-03-13 | House | New draft of H104 |
2019-03-13 | House | Pending new draft of H104 |
2019-03-13 | House | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H104 (Replaces) 2019-03-13 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) adopted, see H3594
S37 (Replaces) 2019-03-25 - Accompanied S2186
S2166 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1275 (Similar To) 2020-09-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4942
H159 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3199 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H151 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5088
H3686 (Replaced by) 2019-04-10 - See H3594
S2338 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #94 [YEAS 38 - NAYS 0]
H4083 (Similar To) 2019-11-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4163
S2349 (Similar To) 2019-09-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S37 (Replaces) 2019-03-25 - Accompanied S2186
S2166 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1275 (Similar To) 2020-09-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4942
H159 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3199 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H151 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5088
H3686 (Replaced by) 2019-04-10 - See H3594
S2338 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #94 [YEAS 38 - NAYS 0]
H4083 (Similar To) 2019-11-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4163
S2349 (Similar To) 2019-09-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means