MA H1207 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5125
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5125
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5125
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to create a fiscal incentive program for veterans to pursue degrees in science, technology, engineering and mathematics (STEM) fields. Higher Education.
Title
Relative to the creation of the battlefield to STEM field incentive program
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Donahue [D] | Rep. Paul Schmid [D] | Sen. Michael Moore [D] | Rep. Brian Murray [D] |
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-25 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5125 |
2019-07-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
H2395 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2398 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2401 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2370 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2133 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2541 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H3236 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
H3214 (Similar To) 2020-10-19 - House concurred
H3044 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
H3215 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
H3246 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
H2386 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S2166 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2333 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S2337 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H5125 (Replaced by) 2020-11-25 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2398 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2401 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2370 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2133 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2541 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H3236 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
H3214 (Similar To) 2020-10-19 - House concurred
H3044 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
H3215 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
H3246 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
H2386 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S2166 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2333 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S2337 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H5125 (Replaced by) 2020-11-25 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1207 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1207.pdf |