MA H1266 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4460
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4460
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4460
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Kane of Holyoke, a petition of Michael F. Kane that cities and towns be authorized to increase the density of property zoned for residential usage to provide additional affordable housing units. Housing.
Title
Relative to zoning density
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-01 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4460 |
2011-10-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/31/2011 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
H4460 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H1266 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=13159&generalCourtId=1 |