MA H151 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4434
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4434
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4434
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide for reimbursement to cities and towns for extraordinary special education costs. Education.
Title
Further providing for reimbursement to cities and towns for extraordinary special education costs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-10 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4434 |
2011-05-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/17/2011 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H4434 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H151 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=10403&generalCourtId=1 |