MA H1550 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to further enforce the installation of automatic sprinkler systems in state owned buildings. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
To ensure fire safety in state buildings
Sponsors
Rep. Ruth Balser [D] | Sen. Gale Candaras [D] | Rep. Frank Smizik [D] | Rep. Edward Coppinger [D] |
Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Rep. Martin Walsh [D] | Rep. Thomas Stanley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-06-28 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Ways and Means |
2012-05-14 | House | House concurred |
2012-05-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-05-03 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday, June 20, 2012 |
2012-05-03 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2011-10-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/11/2011 from 12:00 AM-05:00 AM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H1550 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=11786&generalCourtId=1 |