MA H1777 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to tax title expense on land taken or sold for nonpayment of taxes. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Relative to tax title expense
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-09 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-12-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-12-09 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2019-12-05 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-10-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H2504 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S90 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
S1199 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S960 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Accompanied H1413
S527 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - New draft substituted, see S2520
S2202 (Similar To) 2019-06-05 - Accompanied H3698
H3698 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4545
S2239 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - New draft substituted, see S2303
S2256 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3915 (Similar To) 2020-07-30 - New draft substituted, see H4920
S2292 (Similar To) 2019-08-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 53 of the Acts of 2019
S2300 (Similar To) 2020-09-24 - New Draft substituted, see S2915
H4009 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 88 of the Acts of 2020
H4038 (Similar To) 2020-02-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 25 of the Acts of 2020
S2335 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - New draft substituted, see S2781
S1760 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H2953 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1200 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2524
S2374 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 126 of the Acts of 2019
S2385 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4178 (Similar To) 2020-09-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 177 of the Acts of 2020
H4198 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
H4221 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4775
S2422 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Rules
S2445 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - New draft substituted, see S2636
H4277 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 89 of the Acts of 2020
S90 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
S1199 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S960 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Accompanied H1413
S527 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - New draft substituted, see S2520
S2202 (Similar To) 2019-06-05 - Accompanied H3698
H3698 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4545
S2239 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - New draft substituted, see S2303
S2256 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3915 (Similar To) 2020-07-30 - New draft substituted, see H4920
S2292 (Similar To) 2019-08-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 53 of the Acts of 2019
S2300 (Similar To) 2020-09-24 - New Draft substituted, see S2915
H4009 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 88 of the Acts of 2020
H4038 (Similar To) 2020-02-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 25 of the Acts of 2020
S2335 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - New draft substituted, see S2781
S1760 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H2953 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1200 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2524
S2374 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 126 of the Acts of 2019
S2385 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4178 (Similar To) 2020-09-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 177 of the Acts of 2020
H4198 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
H4221 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4775
S2422 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Rules
S2445 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - New draft substituted, see S2636
H4277 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 89 of the Acts of 2020
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1777 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1777.pdf |