MA H1779 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4651
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the Department of Public Utilities to promulgate rules and regulations relative to landscape management by transmission companies. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to vegetation management plans for transmission companies and railroads
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Walsh [D] | Rep. Paul Heroux [D] | Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D] | Rep. Mary Keefe [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4651 |
2017-06-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S1859 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
S409 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2489
S1847 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
H1774 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H1778 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H1762 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H1732 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H474 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4529
H4651 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S409 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2489
S1847 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
H1774 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H1778 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H1762 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H1732 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H474 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4529
H4651 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1779 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1779.pdf |