MA H186 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize Jefte Rivera to apply for a certificate B journeyman electrician license. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to licensure requirements for Jefte Rivera
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2017-06-19 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2017-05-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/09/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S172 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1338 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1338 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H186 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H186.pdf |