MA H186 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4324
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4324
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4324
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize cities and towns to deny housing applications that are inconsistent with housing production plans. Community Development and Small Businesses.
Title
Relative to housing production plans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-30 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4324 |
2019-08-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/25/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Community Development and Small Businesses |
Same As/Similar To
H341 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S216 (Similar To) 2020-08-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H254 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H1792 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4289
H1393 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H4324 (Replaced by) 2020-01-30 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S216 (Similar To) 2020-08-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H254 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H1792 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4289
H1393 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H4324 (Replaced by) 2020-01-30 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H186 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H186.pdf |