MA H1864 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3761
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3761
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3761
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to parking for vehicles of home care clinicians. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Relative to vehicles of home care clinicians
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-14 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3761 |
2013-04-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/01/2013 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H3761 (Replaced by) 2014-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4265
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H1864 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H1864.pdf |