MA H1868 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. McMurtry of Dedham, a petition of Paul McMurtry and others that the Registrar of Motor Vehicles be authorized to make driving records available online for informational purposes. Transportation.
Title
Promoting personal access of driving records
Sponsors
Rep. Paul McMurtry [D] | Rep. Leonard Mirra [R] | Rep. James Dwyer [D] | Rep. James Miceli [D] |
Rep. David Linsky [D] | Rep. Mary Keefe [D] | Rep. Chris Walsh [D] | Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-03-29 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2017-07-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2017 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H3441 (Similar To) 2018-06-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4649
H1839 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H1838 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H2753 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H1870 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H1866 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied H1856
H1839 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H1838 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H2753 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H1870 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H1866 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied H1856
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1868 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1868.pdf |