MA H1962 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5023
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish training wages. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Creating a training wage
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-06 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5023 |
2021-10-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/19/2021 from 10:30 AM-04:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
H2098 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5194
H514 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3974
H2397 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1243 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5201
H4020 (Similar To) 2022-01-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Acts of 2022
S419 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4471
S254 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied S269
H5023 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1950 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2721
H1964 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5023
S1189 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied H2046
S1208 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2721
H514 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3974
H2397 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1243 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5201
H4020 (Similar To) 2022-01-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Acts of 2022
S419 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4471
S254 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied S269
H5023 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1950 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2721
H1964 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5023
S1189 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied H2046
S1208 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2721
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1962 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1962.pdf |