MA H2003 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4170
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4170
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4170
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the membership of the Science, Technology, Engineering and Math, or STEM, Advisory Council. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.
Title
Relative to the STEM advisory council
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-05 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4170 |
2017-09-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/19/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Springfield Technical Community College |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies |
Same As/Similar To
H1782 (Similar To) 2018-01-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1423 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H1236 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1455 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H2993 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H1003 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1983 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H1712 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2540 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H4170 (Replaced by) 2018-02-07 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1423 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H1236 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1455 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H2993 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H1003 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1983 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H1712 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2540 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H4170 (Replaced by) 2018-02-07 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2003 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2003.pdf |