MA H2021 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H2024
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Senate concurred in the House further amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Senate concurred in the House further amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Order (filed by Mr. Galvin of Canton) for the adoption of permanent Joint Rules for the 191st General Court governing the 2019-2020 legislative sessions (House, No. 2021). January 28, 2019.
Title
Order (filed by Mr. Galvin of Canton) for the adoption of permanent Joint Rules for the 191st General Court governing the 2019-2020 legislative sessions (House, No. 2021). January 28, 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-30 - House - House On adoption of the order Yea and Nay No. 26 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House On adoption of amendment #12 Yea and Nay No. 25 (Y: 36 N: 121 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-30 - House - House On adoption of amendment #11 Yea and Nay No. 24 (Y: 47 N: 110 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-30 - House - House On adoption of amendment #10 Yea and Nay No. 23 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House On adoption of amendment #12 Yea and Nay No. 25 (Y: 36 N: 121 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-30 - House - House On adoption of amendment #11 Yea and Nay No. 24 (Y: 47 N: 110 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-30 - House - House On adoption of amendment #10 Yea and Nay No. 23 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate concurred in the House further amendment |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-03-07 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment with a further amendment, striking all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of House document numbered 3510 |
2019-03-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Order adopted, as amended |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Amended (DiDomenico) by inserting the text of S19 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read, rules suspended |
2019-01-30 | House | Order adopted - 157 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 26) |
2019-01-30 | House | Amendment 12 rejected - 36 YEAS to 121 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 25) |
2019-01-30 | House | Amendment 11 rejected - 47 YEAS to 110 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 24) |
2019-01-30 | House | Amendment 10 adopted - 157 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 23) |
2019-01-30 | House | Amendment 9 rejected |
2019-01-30 | House | Amendment 7 rejected |
2019-01-30 | House | Amendment 6 rejected |
2019-01-30 | House | Amendment 4 rejected |
2019-01-30 | House | Amendment 3 rejected |
2019-01-30 | House | Amendment 2 rejected |
2019-01-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-01-30 | House | Committee recommended ought to be adopted |
2019-01-30 | House | Order adopted, see H2024 |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to the temporary committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H2024 (Replaced by) 2019-01-30 - Adopted, see H2021
H2019 (Similar To) 2019-01-30 - Published as amended, see H2020
S17 (Similar To) 2019-01-31 - Report accepted, as amended - see Roll Call #7 [39 YEAS - 0 NAYS]
H1506 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3409 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3495 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H3286 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3478 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3510 (Similar To) 2019-03-07 - Text of an amendment, see H2021
H3607 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1473 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1381 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H2019 (Similar To) 2019-01-30 - Published as amended, see H2020
S17 (Similar To) 2019-01-31 - Report accepted, as amended - see Roll Call #7 [39 YEAS - 0 NAYS]
H1506 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3409 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3495 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H3286 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3478 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3510 (Similar To) 2019-03-07 - Text of an amendment, see H2021
H3607 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1473 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1381 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2021 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2021.pdf |
Roll Call | https://malegislature.gov/Journal/House/191/RollCalls/hj01302019_RollCalls.pdf |