MA H2175 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4638
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That long-term care facilities be directed to notify the Department of Public Health of voluntary closures of such facilities
Title
Relative to the voluntary closure of long term care facilities.
Sponsors
Rep. Stephen Canessa [D] | Rep. Stephen DiNatale [D] | Sen. Barbara L'Italien [D] | Sen. Marc Pacheco [D] |
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] | Rep. David Torrisi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-29 | Accompanied a study order, see H4638 | |
2010-03-01 | Reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Joint Committee on Health Care Financing | |
2009-01-20 | Senate concurred | |
2009-01-20 | Referred to the committee on Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H4638 (Replaced by) 2010-04-30 - Reported, in part, by H04451
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/186/House/H2175 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=1985&generalCourtId=2 |