MA H2190 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4778
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish uniform confidentiality and enforcement provisions relative to certain licensees under the jurisdiction of the Division of Banks. Financial Services.
Title
Establishing uniform confidentiality and enforcement provisions relative to certain licensees under the jurisdiction of the Division of Banks
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-18 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4778 |
2018-01-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/16/2018 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S951 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1773 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S591 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - New draft substituted, see S2296
H2982 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H1032 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
H2105 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4320
H2960 (Similar To) 2018-02-05 - Accompanied S591
H4778 (Replaced by) 2018-07-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S1773 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S591 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - New draft substituted, see S2296
H2982 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H1032 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
H2105 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4320
H2960 (Similar To) 2018-02-05 - Accompanied S591
H4778 (Replaced by) 2018-07-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2190 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2190.pdf |