MA H2213 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4528
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the reimbursement rates for out-of-state providers that contract with MassHealth. Health Care Financing.
Title
To require equivalent Medicaid reimbursement
Sponsors
Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D] | Rep. Jose Tosado [D] | Rep. Chris Walsh [D] | Rep. William Pignatelli [D] |
Rep. Gailanne Cariddi [D] | Sen. Adam Hinds [D] | Sen. Paul Mark [D] | Sen. Brendan Crighton [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-24 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4528 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-04-24 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 16, 2018, pending concurrence |
2018-03-01 | House | House concurred |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday April 25, 2018, pending concurrence |
2017-05-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
S336 (Similar To) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2604
S1165 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S639 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - House concurred
H615 (Similar To) 2018-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4605
H342 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
H602 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H4257 (Similar To) 2018-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4692
H4528 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1165 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S639 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - House concurred
H615 (Similar To) 2018-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4605
H342 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
H602 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H4257 (Similar To) 2018-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4692
H4528 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2213 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2213.pdf |