MA H2363 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4859
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-31 - New draft substituted, see H4859
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-31 - New draft substituted, see H4859
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to include adoption in the definition of "elderly relative" in the family and medical leave enforcement law [corrected]. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Relative to the small necessities leave act
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Cusack [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-31 | House | New draft substituted, see H4859 |
2018-07-31 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) |
2018-07-31 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-07-31 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending |
2018-07-31 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2018-07-31 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill with the same title, see H4859 |
2017-10-19 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S1083 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2440
S1174 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
H3131 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S510 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H773 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H709 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H512 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H4859 (Replaced by) 2018-08-06 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1174 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
H3131 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S510 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H773 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H709 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H512 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H4859 (Replaced by) 2018-08-06 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2363 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2363.pdf |