MA H2370 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5443
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 63-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H5443
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H5443
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to providing for equity in the administering of COVID-19 vaccinations. Public Health.
Title
Effectuating equity in COVID-19 vaccination
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-27 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5443 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-17 | House | Reporting date extended to Saturday December 31, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-06-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/12/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1515 (Similar To) 2022-12-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S3163
S1909 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
S760 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
H3245 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4969
H3246 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4969
S2529 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S673 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S502 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2880
S1212 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2882
S1424 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S1426 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
H498 (Similar To) 2022-07-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4968
H5443 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1909 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
S760 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
H3245 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4969
H3246 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4969
S2529 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S673 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S502 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2880
S1212 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2882
S1424 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S1426 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
H498 (Similar To) 2022-07-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4968
H5443 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2370 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2370.pdf |