MA H2655 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3780
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-3)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-09-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3780
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-09-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3780
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize municipalities to reduce the real property tax obligations of persons over the age of sixty in exchange for volunteer service. Revenue.
Title
Enhancing the volunteer service tax reduction for seniors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-30 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3780 |
2015-07-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/28/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H3780 (Replaced by) 2015-10-08 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H930 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1129 (Similar To) 2015-12-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2654 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H3063 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H1060 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H930 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1129 (Similar To) 2015-12-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2654 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H3063 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H1060 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2655 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2655.pdf |