MA H2779 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4960
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to include certain certified emergency telecommunicators in Group 2 of the contributory retirement system for public employees. Public Service.
Title
Relative to Massachusetts certified emergency telecommunicators
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-05 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4960 |
2021-10-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2797 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2798 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2699 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S1738 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1687 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H4960 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2798 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2699 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S1738 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1687 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H4960 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2779 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2779.pdf |