MA H2859 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 31 of the Acts of 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 31 of the Acts of 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the Mohawk Trail Regional School District to continue to operate as a pre-kindergarten through grade twelve school district. Education.
Title
Relative to the Mohawk Trail Regional School District and the Hawlemont Regional School District
Sponsors
Rep. Stephen Kulik [D] | Sen. Adam Hinds [D] | Sen. Paul Mark [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-30 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 31 of the Acts of 2017 | |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2017-06-29 | House | Enacted |
2017-06-29 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2017-06-29 | House | Put upon its final passage |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2017-06-05 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2017-05-30 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2017-05-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-05-30 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2017-05-25 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2017-04-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/13/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H1154 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H126 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4563
H1822 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2228 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
H2884 (Similar To) 2018-01-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4116
H186 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H198 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H940 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H3441 (Similar To) 2018-06-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4649
H1082 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3850 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4261
H4918 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 352 of the Acts of 2018
H126 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4563
H1822 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2228 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
H2884 (Similar To) 2018-01-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4116
H186 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H198 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H940 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H3441 (Similar To) 2018-06-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4649
H1082 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3850 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4261
H4918 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 352 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2859 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2859.pdf |