MA H2893 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4997
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4997
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4997
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Fernandes of Falmouth, a petition of Dylan A. Fernandes and Sarah K. Peake that the Department of Revenue be authorized to develop an updated rate table for calculation of the estate tax. Revenue.
Title
To mitigate snowbird relocation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-11 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4997 |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-05-23 | House | Reporting date extended to Sunday July 31, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 4, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-12-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/28/2021 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S1835 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4997
S1911 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4997
S1862 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5245
H2943 (Similar To) 2022-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5279
H4997 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1911 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4997
S1862 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5245
H2943 (Similar To) 2022-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5279
H4997 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2893 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2893.pdf |