MA H2899 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to recording fees paid by certified public accountants to registers of deeds and assistant recorders under the community preservation law. Revenue.
Title
Reducing CPA recording fees for affordable housing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-04-07 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2022-01-24 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 01/28/2022 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2022-01-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/28/2022 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H3809 (Similar To) 2021-12-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 97 of the Acts of 2021
S882 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H3722 (Similar To) 2022-06-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 73 of the Acts of 2022
H1392 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H1393 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H4083 (Similar To) 2022-01-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Acts of 2022
S895 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H1399 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H1389 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S1853 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5351
S868 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5351
S873 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2025 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2681
H2981 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
H1384 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S882 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H3722 (Similar To) 2022-06-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 73 of the Acts of 2022
H1392 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H1393 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H4083 (Similar To) 2022-01-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Acts of 2022
S895 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H1399 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H1389 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S1853 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5351
S868 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5351
S873 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2025 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2681
H2981 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
H1384 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2899 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2899.pdf |