MA H2986 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5126
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the composition of the Board of Directors of the Massachusetts Port Authority. Transportation.
Title
Relative to the composition of the Board of Directors of the Massachusetts Port Authority
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D] | Rep. Daniel Hunt [D] | Rep. Angelo Scaccia [D] | Sen. Liz Miranda [D] |
Rep. Daniel Ryan [D] | Sen. Joseph Boncore [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-19 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5126 |
2019-06-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/19/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S1562 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1580 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S1380 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S2037 (Similar To) 2020-04-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3574 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5117
H1077 (Similar To) 2021-01-04 - New draft substituted, see H5230
H3792 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
H5126 (Replaced by) 2020-11-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S1580 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S1380 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S2037 (Similar To) 2020-04-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3574 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5117
H1077 (Similar To) 2021-01-04 - New draft substituted, see H5230
H3792 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
H5126 (Replaced by) 2020-11-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2986 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2986.pdf |