MA H3024 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5245
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5245
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5245
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to a certain property tax exemption for the elderly. Revenue.
Title
Relative to a certain property tax exemption for the elderly
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-22 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5245 |
2021-12-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/28/2021 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H3901 (Similar To) 2022-10-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 241 of the Acts of 2022
H3766 (Similar To) 2022-07-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 100 of the Acts of 2022
H3767 (Similar To) 2023-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 390 of the Acts of 2022
H3731 (Similar To) 2022-08-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 193 of the Acts of 2022
H3989 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 225 of the Acts of 2022
S2512 (Similar To) 2022-09-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 210 of the Acts of 2022
H4107 (Similar To) 2022-04-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3064 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5245
S1916 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied H2915
H2905 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied H2915
H1548 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H3355 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
S1957 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
S1937 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied H2915
H5245 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3766 (Similar To) 2022-07-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 100 of the Acts of 2022
H3767 (Similar To) 2023-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 390 of the Acts of 2022
H3731 (Similar To) 2022-08-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 193 of the Acts of 2022
H3989 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 225 of the Acts of 2022
S2512 (Similar To) 2022-09-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 210 of the Acts of 2022
H4107 (Similar To) 2022-04-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3064 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5245
S1916 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied H2915
H2905 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied H2915
H1548 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H3355 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
S1957 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
S1937 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied H2915
H5245 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3024 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3024.pdf |