MA H3989 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 225 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 225 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Leicester be authorized to grant full annual property tax exemptions to the surviving spouse of Rutland police detective and Leicester resident John D. Songy. Revenue. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
To give the town of Leicester authority to grant full annual property tax exemptions to the surviving spouse of Rutland Police Detective and Leicester resident John D. Songy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-26 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 225 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-09-22 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2022-09-22 | House | Enacted |
2022-09-19 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2022-09-19 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2022-05-31 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-03-28 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-03-28 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-03-28 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2022-03-10 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2021-10-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/18/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-07-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-07-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H3901 (Similar To) 2022-10-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 241 of the Acts of 2022
H3766 (Similar To) 2022-07-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 100 of the Acts of 2022
H3767 (Similar To) 2023-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 390 of the Acts of 2022
S1362 (Similar To) 2021-12-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 112 of the Acts of 2021
H3731 (Similar To) 2022-08-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 193 of the Acts of 2022
S2512 (Similar To) 2022-09-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 210 of the Acts of 2022
H4107 (Similar To) 2022-04-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2983 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
H3064 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5245
S1916 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied H2915
H2905 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied H2915
H2918 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1957 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
S1937 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied H2915
H4211 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 87 of the Acts of 2021
S2907 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4841 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3766 (Similar To) 2022-07-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 100 of the Acts of 2022
H3767 (Similar To) 2023-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 390 of the Acts of 2022
S1362 (Similar To) 2021-12-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 112 of the Acts of 2021
H3731 (Similar To) 2022-08-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 193 of the Acts of 2022
S2512 (Similar To) 2022-09-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 210 of the Acts of 2022
H4107 (Similar To) 2022-04-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2983 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
H3064 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5245
S1916 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied H2915
H2905 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied H2915
H2918 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1957 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
S1937 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied H2915
H4211 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 87 of the Acts of 2021
S2907 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4841 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3989 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3989.pdf |